EP4156728 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 21.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Meng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Yanmei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
GE, Cuili Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21831956.4 | 16.06.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021CN100451 | Priority number, date | CN202010615193 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010615193 | [2023/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022001671 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156728 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04W4/021, H04W64/00, H04W76/40, // H04W88/14, H04L12/18, H04W36/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04W76/40 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W24/02 (CN,KR);
H04L12/189 (EP);
H04W36/0007 (EP,KR);
H04W4/021 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W4/10 (CN);
H04W72/30 (CN,KR);
H04L12/1845 (EP);
H04W88/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | H04W4/10, H04W4/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/13] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | Translation filed | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 21.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP4114046 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); |