EP4175111 - CHARGING CIRCUIT AND CHARGING CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Pengfei Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21833101.5 | 25.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021CN102359 | Priority number, date | CN202010603516 | 29.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010603516 | [2023/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022001869 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175111 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H03K17/78 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H02J7/00034 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/00032 (CN,KR);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US);
H02J7/00047 (EP);
H02J7/0047 (CN,KR);
H02J7/0071 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | LADESCHALTUNG UND LADEKABEL | [2023/18] | English: | CHARGING CIRCUIT AND CHARGING CABLE | [2023/18] | French: | CIRCUIT DE CHARGE ET CÂBLE DE CHARGE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2023 | Translation filed | 20.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 16.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN106549463 (DONGGUAN TAIYE ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]US2018145469 (CHUNG IL-HYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN106300314B (INT GREEN CHIP CORP (IGC)) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |