EP4144886 - STAINLESS STEEL SHEET WITH AL COATING LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIZUTANI, Akito Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
FUJISAWA, Mitsuyuki Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21833108.0 | 20.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021JP16054 | Priority number, date | JP20200114356 | 01.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020114356 | [2023/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022004100 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144886 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/46, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/22, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/44, C22C38/50, C23C2/12, C23C10/28, C23C10/60, C23C2/28, B32B15/01, C22C38/00, C23C10/58, C22C21/00, C22C38/40 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
C23C2/12 (EP,KR);
C23C30/005 (US);
B32B15/012 (EP);
C22C21/00 (EP,KR);
C22C38/00 (KR);
C22C38/001 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/004 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/40 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/42 (EP);
C22C38/44 (EP);
C22C38/46 (EP);
C22C38/50 (EP);
C22C38/54 (EP,KR);
C23C10/28 (EP);
C23C10/58 (EP);
C23C10/60 (EP);
C23C14/16 (EP);
C23C14/5806 (EP);
C23C2/28 (EP);
C23C2/40 (KR);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR);
C23C14/0617 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | C23C26/00, C22C21/00, C22C38/00, C22C38/40, C22C38/54, C21D9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | EDELSTAHLBLECH MIT AL-BESCHICHTUNGSSCHICHT | [2023/10] | English: | STAINLESS STEEL SHEET WITH AL COATING LAYER | [2023/10] | French: | FEUILLE D'ACIER INOXYDABLE DOTÉE D'UNE COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT EN AL | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2022 | Translation filed | 29.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05283149 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]US6197132 (ANDERSSON-DRUGGE ING-MARIE [SE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, lines 55-58 * * column 3; example 1 *; | [A]US6203632 (HEUBNER ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [A]US2001032687 (ANTONI LAURENT [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH01159384 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-2; | [A]JPH09104962 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP], et al)[A] 1-2; | [A]JP2016102231 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-2; | [A]WO2017208671 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-2; | [A]JP6687177B (JFE STEEL CORP.) [A] 1-2 | by applicant | JPH02133563 | JP2004169110 |