EP4151469 - IMPACT ABSORBING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANESAN, Balamurugan 85375 Neufahrn b. Freising / DE | 02 /
SCHMITZ, Sebastian 85375 Neufahrn b. Freising / DE | 03 /
MIYAKE, Naoki 85375 Neufahrn b. Freising / DE | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21833387.0 | 28.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021JP20528 | Priority number, date | JP20200112442 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020112442 | [2023/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022004221 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151469 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/04, B60J5/04, F16F7/00, F16F7/12 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
B60J5/0452 (EP);
B60J5/0484 (US);
B60J5/0443 (US);
B60J5/0461 (US);
F16F7/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | B60R19/04, B60J5/00, F16F7/00, F16F7/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | STOSSDÄMPFENDE STRUKTUR | [2023/12] | English: | IMPACT ABSORBING STRUCTURE | [2023/12] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ABSORPTION D'IMPACT | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2022 | Translation filed | 15.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5820406Y ; | [Y]EP1172260 (KYORAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2013154286 (TAMADA TERUO [JP], et al); | [T]EP3508535 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | International search | [XA]JPS5820406Y ; | [XA]JPH05246243 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [XA]JP2005536392 | by applicant | JPH031749B | JPH04129316U | JPH0834302 | JP2010100259 | JP2018065452 |