EP4175627 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EcoPlanet Environmental LLC 23 Bearcat Loop Belgrade, MT 59714 / US | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STROBEL, Gary A. Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | 02 /
BLATT, Bryan Manhattan, Montana 59718 / US | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21833660.0 | 02.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021US40275 | Priority number, date | US202063047672P | 02.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063047672 P | US202063059584P | 31.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063059584 P | US202063090913P | 13.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063090913 P | US202063110151P | 05.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063110151 P | US202063123069P | 09.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063123069 P | US202163141271P | 25.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163141271 P | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022006510 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175627 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/22, A61K31/192, A61P31/14, A61P31/16, A23K20/105, A23K20/111, A61P31/12, A61K31/19, A23K50/10, A23K50/20, A23K50/30, A61L11/00 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A23K20/105 (EP,US);
A23K50/10 (EP);
A23K50/20 (EP);
A23K50/30 (EP);
A61K31/215 (US);
A61L11/00 (EP,US);
A61L2/0082 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/22, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/19] | A61K31/22, A61K31/192, A61P31/14, A61P31/16, A23K20/105, A23K20/111 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFEKTIONEN | [2023/19] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING INFECTIONS | [2023/19] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 18.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN102458129 (JENEIL BIOSURFACTANT COMPANY); | [A]US2013210910 (MLADENOVICH PETER [CA]); | [A]WO2016003358 (BIOMEDICALS SWEDEN AB [SE]); | [A]EP2903608 (PROPONENT BIOTECH GMBH [CH]); | [X]WO2020069407 (ECOPLANET ENV LLC [US]); |