EP4174566 - OPTICAL PATH CONTROL MEMBER AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Jin Gyeong Seoul 07796 / KR | 02 /
JU, Chan Mi Seoul 07796 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Byung Sook Seoul 07796 / KR | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21834602.1 | 28.06.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021KR08056 | Priority number, date | KR20200080132 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200080132 | [2023/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022005124 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174566 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/1675, G02F1/1676, H10K50/86 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G02F1/1675 (EP,KR);
G02F1/167 (KR);
G02F1/133512 (US);
G02F1/1323 (EP);
G02F1/13338 (US);
G02F1/133524 (KR);
G02F1/134309 (US);
G02F1/13439 (US);
G02F1/1676 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | G02F1/167, G02F1/1675, G02F1/1335, H01L51/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES WEGSTEUERUNGSELEMENT UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2023/18] | English: | OPTICAL PATH CONTROL MEMBER AND DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2023/18] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE COMMANDE DE TRAJET OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE LE COMPRENANT | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2023 | Translation filed | 16.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013271820 (NAKAHARA HIROKI [JP]); | [A]JP2019060946 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]WO2019206035 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]JP2020086210 (TIANMA JAPAN LTD) | International search | [XY]KR101512857B ; | [Y]WO2015122083 (NLT TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2017203803 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2019060946 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]KR20190060889 (E INK CORP [US]) |