EP4263238 - CAR TYRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 25 20126 Milano / IT | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPEZIARI, Diego Ettore 20126 Milano / IT | 02 /
BOLZONI, Roberto 20126 Milano / IT | 03 /
MONTESELLO, Stefano 20126 Milano / IT | 04 /
CASAROTTO, Giovanni 20126 Milano / IT | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Fabiano, Piero Fabiano, Franke & MGT Sagl Piazzetta San Carlo, 2 6900 Lugano / CH | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21834907.4 | 10.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021IB61551 | Priority number, date | IT20200031454 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: IT202000031454 | [2023/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022130143 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4263238 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/03, B60C11/12 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B60C11/0306 (EP);
B60C11/1236 (EP,US);
B60C11/0304 (EP,US);
B60C11/033 (US);
B60C2011/0341 (EP,US);
B60C2011/0344 (EP);
B60C2011/0365 (EP);
B60C2011/0381 (EP);
B60C2011/0388 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGREIFEN | [2023/43] | English: | CAR TYRE | [2023/43] | French: | PNEU D'AUTOMOBILE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 14.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0547019 (SEMPERIT AG [AT]); | [XAYI]EP3000621 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | [XAI]EP3081398 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]); | [XA]US2017361659 (YAMAKAWA TAKAHIRO [JP]) |