EP4255800 - WATERCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mäkeniq UG (Haftungsbeschränkt) Anton-Günther-Strasse 7d 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖRNER, Felix 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Frommhold, Joachim Weinmann Zimmerli AG Apollostrasse 2 Postfach 1021 8032 Zürich / CH | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21836628.4 | 06.12.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021IB61105 | Priority number, date | CH20210070534 | 10.11.2021 Original published format: CH 0705342021 | CH20200001536 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: CH 15362020 | [2023/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022118185 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4255800 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/10, B63B1/32, B63B1/40 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
B63B1/107 (EP,US);
B63B1/121 (US);
B63B1/28 (US);
B63B1/32 (EP);
B63B1/40 (EP);
B63H2021/171 (EP);
B63J2003/003 (EP);
Y02T70/00 (EP);
Y02T70/10 (EP);
Y02T70/5236 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | WASSERFAHRZEUG | [2023/41] | English: | WATERCRAFT | [2023/41] | French: | VÉHICULE MARIN | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 05.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4174671 (SEIDL LUDWIG H [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document * [I] 3; | [A]DE202014007133U (ABEKING & RASMUSSEN SCHIFFS UND YACHTWERFT AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO2020016651 (SOLARIMPACT YACHT AG [CH]) [X] 1-10 * page 5, paragraphs 1-2 * * figure - * * page 5, paragraph l * | by applicant | DE202004017969U | DE202009011206U | DE202010015531U | DE202013010071U |