EP4181506 - IMAGE FUSION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Ezviz Software Co., Ltd. Room 302, Unit B Building 2, 399 Danfeng Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Shijie Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310051 / CN | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21837892.5 | 07.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021CN104976 | Priority number, date | CN202010649911 | 08.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010649911 | [2023/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022007840 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4181506 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/18, H04N23/951 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
H04N23/958 (EP);
H04N7/181 (EP,CN);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T3/40 (US);
G06T5/70 (US);
H04N23/61 (US);
H04N23/695 (US);
H04N23/951 (EP,CN,US);
G06T2207/10148 (EP);
G06T2207/20221 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/20] | H04N7/18, H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | BILDFUSIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/20] | English: | IMAGE FUSION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FUSION D'IMAGES | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2023 | Translation filed | 10.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 23.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018048825 (WANG KENG CHUN [TW]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 6 ** paragraphs [0007] - [0010] *; | [X]US2018096487 (NASH JAMES WILSON [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0079] * * paragraphs [0086] - [0097] * |