EP4181166 - CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xiamen Hongfa Electrical Safety & Controls Co., Ltd No. 566 Donglin Rd. Jimei North Ind. District Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Xinde Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | 02 /
LIN, Yaoguo Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Yingbo Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Weijie Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Mo Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | 06 /
ZHUO, Jianghai Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Jinquan Xiamen, Fujian 361000 / CN | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21838257.0 | 09.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021CN105581 | Priority number, date | CN202010663860 | 10.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010663860 | CN202010664900 | 10.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010664900 | CN202010663853 | 10.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010663853 | CN20201147837 | 29.09.2020 Original published format: CN202011047837 | CN20211004264 | 04.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110004264 | [2023/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022007962 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4181166 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/664, H01H33/666 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
H01H71/525 (EP);
H01H71/0207 (EP);
H01H9/302 (EP);
H01H9/362 (EP);
H01H9/446 (EP);
H01H71/1009 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | SCHUTZSCHALTER | [2023/20] | English: | CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2023/20] | French: | DISJONCTEUR | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2023 | Translation filed | 09.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |