EP4162920 - DENTAL ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND DENTAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | [2023/18] |
Former [2023/15] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7122 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAKINUMA, Naoyuki Sodegaura-shi, Chiba 299-0265 / JP | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21838297.6 | 09.07.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021JP25954 | Priority number, date | JP20200118821 | 09.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020118821 | JP20200118822 | 09.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020118822 | [2023/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022009986 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162920 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/30 | [2024/41] | CPC: |
A61K6/30 (EP,US);
A61K6/79 (US);
A61K6/891 (US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/08 (EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/15] | A61K6/30, A61K6/60, A61K6/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | DENTALE KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DENTALMATERIAL | [2023/15] | English: | DENTAL ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND DENTAL MATERIAL | [2023/15] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE DENTAIRE ET MATÉRIAU DENTAIRE | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2023 | Translation filed | 03.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JP2004529946 ; | [XA]WO2016159219 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [XY]WO2017026187 (G C DENTAL IND CORP [JP]); | [XY]WO2019107323 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) | by applicant | JP2018145133 | JP2020118821 | JP2020118822 |