EP4180392 - CARBON MATERIAL DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO., LTD. 7-6 Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMANAKA, Hiroyuki Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Yoshikazu Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 03 /
KAMABAYASHI, Jun Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | 04 /
DOI, Seiji Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/20] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21838409.7 | 02.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021JP25187 | Priority number, date | JP20200118584 | 09.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020118584 | [2023/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022009805 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180392 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C01B32/174, C01B32/194, C08F20/10, C08F20/56, C08F290/06, C08K3/04, C09C1/44, C09D17/00, C08F8/44, C08F220/34, C01B32/21, C09D133/14, C09D5/24, C08L33/14, C09C3/10 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
C09C1/56 (EP,US);
C01B32/15 (KR);
H01B1/24 (US);
C01B32/05 (KR);
C01B32/174 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/194 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/21 (EP,KR);
C08F20/10 (KR);
C08F20/56 (KR);
C08F220/346 (EP);
C08F290/06 (KR);
C08F290/062 (EP);
C08F290/142 (US);
C08K3/04 (EP,KR);
C08K7/06 (EP,US);
C08L33/14 (EP);
C08L55/00 (KR);
C09C1/44 (EP);
C09C1/46 (EP);
C09C1/48 (KR);
C09C3/006 (EP);
C09C3/04 (EP);
C09C3/10 (EP);
C09D11/037 (US);
C09D11/52 (US);
C09D133/14 (EP);
C09D17/005 (EP);
C09D5/24 (EP);
C09K23/46 (US);
H01B1/12 (US);
C01B2202/22 (US);
C01B2202/28 (US);
C01B2204/22 (US);
C01B2204/28 (US);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (EP);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C08K2201/001 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/062, C08F212/12, C08F220/34, C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F8/44, C08F220/34 (US,EP);
C08F8/44, C08F220/346 (US,EP);
C09D133/14, C08L55/00, C08K3/041 (US,EP);
C08F220/346, C08F212/08, C08F220/34, C08F212/12 (EP);
C08F220/346, C08F220/1807, C08F220/34, C08F212/12 (EP) (-) |
Former IPC [2024/11] | C01B32/174, C01B32/194, C08F20/10, C08F20/56, C08F290/06, C08K3/04, C09C1/44, C09D17/00, C08F8/44, C08F220/34, C01B32/21, C09D133/14, C09D5/24 | ||
Former IPC [2023/20] | C01B32/174, C01B32/05, C01B32/15, C01B32/194, C08F20/10, C08F20/56, C08F290/06, C08K3/04, C08L55/00, C09C1/44, C09D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFMATERIALDISPERSION | [2023/20] | English: | CARBON MATERIAL DISPERSION | [2023/20] | French: | DISPERSION DE MATÉRIAU CARBONÉ | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2020 | Translation filed | 10.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 18.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5900899 (ICHIZAWA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2013075795 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM, et al); | [A]WO2015143063 (RHODIA OPERATIONS [FR], et al); | [A]JP2016186591 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) | International search | [A]JP2008248412 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2008280450 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM, et al); | [A]JP2009196853 (NOF CORP, et al); | [A]JP2010037537 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [A]JP2010132901 (XEROX CORP); | [A]JP2010173886 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [A]WO2011024800 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012021100 (UNIV TOKUSHIMA, et al); | [A]JP2013075795 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM, et al); | [A]WO2015115102 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2010174084 |