EP4262735 - TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PLANT ROSIN MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLU, Mattia 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 02 /
TAHON, Cédric, Marc 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 03 /
SMETS, Johan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 04 /
RAVIDAT, Nans, Elian 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | 05 /
MADHAV, Prakash, J. Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 06 /
DENUTTE, Hugo, Robert Germain 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 21840404.4 | 14.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021US72891 | Priority number, date | US202063125988P | 16.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063125988 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022133426 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4262735 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/92, A61Q13/00, C11D3/00, C11D7/44 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A61K8/922 (EP);
C11D3/382 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP);
C11D3/0015 (US);
C11D3/50 (EP,US);
C11D2111/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT PFLANZENHARZMATERIALIEN | [2023/43] | English: | TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PLANT ROSIN MATERIALS | [2023/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT COMPRENANT DES MATIÈRES DE COLOPHANES VÉGÉTALES | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 25.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007129476 (MACBEATH CALUM [IT], et al) [I] 1-16* examples 1-3 *; | [X]WO2019051165 (CONAIR [US]) [X] 1-16 * examples 1,2 *; | [X] - Anonymous, "Glycerol ester of wood rosin - Wikipedia", (20200713), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Glycerol_ester_of_wood_rosin, (20210608), XP055811290 [X] 1-7,9-14 * the whole document * | [X] - BAMBANG WIYONO ET AL, "Chemical Compositions of Pine Resin, Rosin and Turpentine Oil from West Java", JOURNAL OF FORESTRY RESEARCH, (20060301), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.20886/ijfr.2006.3.1.7-17, pages 7 - 17, XP055106734 [X] 1-7,9-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.20886/ijfr.2006.3.1.7-17 | [X] - anonymous, "Hair Color Treatment", GNPD, MINTEL, (20161117), Database accession no. 4425271, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/4425271/, XP055905060 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - anonymous, "Moisturizing Lip Balm", GNPD, MINTEL, (20201110), Database accession no. 8253329, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/8253329/, XP055905125 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - anonymous, "Light Luminous Hydrating Lipstick", GNPD, MINTEL, (20200701), Database accession no. 7917363, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/7917363/, XP055905621 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - anonymous, "Foundation EX SPF 50+ PA++++", GNPD, MINTEL, (20200526), Database accession no. 7641827, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/7641827/, XP055905630 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | [X] - anonymous, "Shaving Oil", GNPD, MINTEL, (20180502), Database accession no. 5650397, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/5650397/, XP055905681 [X] 1-16 * abstract * | by applicant | - MILLER, P. M.LAMPARSKY, D., Perfumes: Art, Science and Technology, Steffen Arctander Allured Pub. Co., (19940000), vol. 1, 2 | - L. HALLB. MOHNEYL. KIER, "The Electrotopological State: Structure Information at the Atomic Level for Molecular Graphs", J. Chem. Inf. Comput. Sci., (19910000), vol. 31, pages 76 - 82 | - L. HALLL. KIER, "The Molecular Connectivity Chi Indexes and Kappa Shape Indexes in Structure-Property Modeling", Reviews in Computational Chemistry, (19910000), vol. 2, pages 367 - 422 | - R. TODESCHINIV. CONSONNI, Molecular Descriptors for Chemoinformatics, Wiley-VCH, (20090000), vol. II |