EP4182170 - INK SUPPLY SYSTEMS AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING PRINTING INK TO AN INKING UNIT OF AN INTAGLIO PRINTING UNIT, AND AN INTAGLIO PRINTING UNIT AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INK SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASSOT, Daniel 2503 Bienne / CH | 02 /
STIERMAN, Robert 2408MS Alphen aan den Rijn / NL | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21840816.9 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/21] | WO2021EP86170 | Priority number, date | DE202110103847 | 18.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021103847 | DE202110103846 | 18.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021103846 | DE202110103845 | 18.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021103845 | [2023/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022174958 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4182170 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4182170 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41F9/02, B41F9/06, B41F3/81, B41F31/00, B41F31/02, B41F31/08 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
B41F9/021 (EP);
B41F9/063 (EP,US);
B41F31/002 (EP,US);
B41F31/022 (EP);
B41F31/027 (US);
B41F31/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FARBZUFUHRSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUFUHR VON DRUCKFARBE IN EIN FARBWERK EINES INTAGLIO-DRUCKWERKES SOWIE EIN INTAGLIO-DRUCKWERK UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES FARBZUFUHRSYSTEMS | [2023/21] | English: | INK SUPPLY SYSTEMS AND METHOD FOR SUPPLYING PRINTING INK TO AN INKING UNIT OF AN INTAGLIO PRINTING UNIT, AND AN INTAGLIO PRINTING UNIT AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INK SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2023/21] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ALIMENTATION EN ENCRE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR ALIMENTER EN ENCRE D'IMPRESSION UNE UNITÉ D'ENCRAGE D'UN GROUPE D'IMPRESSION EN CREUX, ET GROUPE D'IMPRESSION EN CREUX ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN ENCRE | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 14.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | [2024/33] | Cited in | International search | [A]US6024015 (DILLING PEER [DE], et al) [A] 5,10-15 * abstract *; | [XAYI]US2001011512 (KOEHLER JAMES E [CA]) [X] 1,5,8,10-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0057]; figures 1-16; claims 1-12 * [A] 2-4,6,7,9,20-30 [Y] 16,17,19 [I] 18; | [A]US6516721 (VOGE MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 2,3* abstract *; | [YA]US2014182467 (IHME ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 16,17 * abstract * [A] 1-15,19-30; | [Y]DE102019103784 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [Y] 19 * paragraphs [0043] , [0 86] - paragraph [0091]; figures 1-17; claims 1 -21 *; | [YA]WO2020224815 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [Y] 16,17,19 * abstract * [A] 1-15,20-30 | by applicant | US4066014 | DE4116989 | DE4137337 | EP0924071 | DE10206290 | DE10246946 | DE202007005544U | DE102008011007 | DE102008022988 | DE102013003923 | DE102015010126 | DE102016209031 | WO2020161056 |