EP4092434 - BATTERY MANAGEMENT DEVICE, BATTERY PACK, ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM AND BATTERY MANAGEMENT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyun-Jun Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [2024/35] |
Former [2022/47] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 21842313.5 | 14.07.2021 | [2022/47] | WO2021KR09065 | Priority number, date | KR20200087749 | 15.07.2020 Original published format: KR 20200087749 | [2022/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022015062 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092434 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4092434 | Date: | 28.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3835, G01R31/36, G01R31/396, G01R31/367, G01R31/364, G01R31/392, H01M10/48, H01M10/42, H02J7/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G01R31/396 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/364 (KR);
G01R31/3648 (EP,KR);
G01R31/367 (KR);
G01R31/3835 (KR,US);
G01R31/392 (EP,KR);
H01M10/425 (EP,KR);
H01M10/48 (EP);
H01M10/482 (EP,KR);
H02J7/005 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,KR);
H01M2220/10 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | G01R31/3835, G01R31/396, G01R31/367, G01R31/364, H01M10/48, H01M10/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BATTERIEPACK, ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM UND BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/47] | English: | BATTERY MANAGEMENT DEVICE, BATTERY PACK, ENERGY STORAGE SYSTEM AND BATTERY MANAGEMENT METHOD | [2022/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION DE BATTERIE, BLOC-BATTERIE, SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE BATTERIE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2022 | Translation filed | 18.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007236182 (PLETT GREGORY L [US]); | [A]WO2019138286 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]); | [A]US2020182939 (AHN HYOUNG JUN [KR]) | International search | [A]US2007236182 (PLETT GREGORY L [US]); | [A]KR20140111920 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2019138286 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]); | [A]KR20190093409 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20190123172 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20200087749 |