EP4174253 - BATTER BOARD PLACEMENT METHOD, BATTER BOARD PLACEMENT PROGRAM, AND SURVEY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Topcon Corporation 75-1 Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHI, Yoshihiro Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Kohei Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Takashi Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21842443.0 | 09.07.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021JP26018 | Priority number, date | JP20200120938 | 14.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020120938 | [2023/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022014505 | Date: | 20.01.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174253 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00, E04G21/18 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP);
E04G21/1833 (US);
G01C15/004 (US);
Y02A90/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | E04G21/18, G01C15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PLATZIERUNG EINER BATTERIEPLATTE, PROGRAMM ZUR PLATZIERUNG EINER BATTERIEPLATTE UND VERMESSUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/18] | English: | BATTER BOARD PLACEMENT METHOD, BATTER BOARD PLACEMENT PROGRAM, AND SURVEY SYSTEM | [2023/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PLACEMENT DE PLANCHE DE REPÈRE, PROGRAMME DE PLACEMENT DE PLANCHE DE REPÈRE ET SYSTÈME D'ARPENTAGE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2023 | Translation filed | 26.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 19.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2562597 (BREUNINGER WILLIAM R)[A] 1-10; | [IA]JP2009210479 (YAMASHINA CORP) [I] 1,5,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] , [0006]; figures 14B, 15G * [A] 2-4,6-8,10; | [A]WO2020119912 (LEICA GEOSYSTEMS AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * page 37, line 16; figure 2 * | International search | [A]US6628308 (GREENBERG JAMES N [NZ], et al) [A] 1-10* , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2004037385 (NTI KK) [A] 1-10 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2005030789 (TOPCON CORP) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0041], [0042], fig. 8 *; | [A]JP2009210479 (YAMASHINA CORP) [A] 1-10 * , paragraphs [0005], [0006], fig. 14 * | by applicant | JPH01241509 |