EP4302012 - ACTIVE MODULE BASED ON LIQUID CRYSTALS FOR ADJUSTABLE CAR HEADLIGHTS AND OTHER LAMPS AND A LAMP WITH SAID MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | 08.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univerza V Ljubljani Kongresni trg 12 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEC, David 4000 Kranj / SI | 02 /
RAVNIK, Miha 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 03 /
MUR, Urban 4276 Hrusica / SI | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Patentni Biro AF d.o.o. Kotnikova 32, p.p. 2706 1001 Ljubljana / SI | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 21843798.6 | 01.12.2021 | [2024/02] | WO2021SI50018 | Priority number, date | SI20210000119 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: SI 202100119 | [2024/02] | Filing language | SL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022260603 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302012 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21S41/64, G03B21/00 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
F21S41/645 (EP);
G03B21/00 (EP);
G03B21/006 (EP);
G03B21/2033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTIVES FLÜSSIGKRISTALLBASIERTES MODUL FÜR VERSTELLBARE AUTOSCHEINWERFER UND ANDERE LAMPEN SOWIE LAMPE MIT DIESEM MODUL | [2024/02] | English: | ACTIVE MODULE BASED ON LIQUID CRYSTALS FOR ADJUSTABLE CAR HEADLIGHTS AND OTHER LAMPS AND A LAMP WITH SAID MODULE | [2024/02] | French: | MODULE ACTIF À BASE DE CRISTAUX LIQUIDES POUR PHARES DE VOITURE RÉGLABLES ET AUTRES LAMPES ET LAMPE ÉQUIPÉE DUDIT MODULE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2012015044 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0086]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2016077402 (TAKEHARA KOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0038] - [0120]; figures 1-23 *; | [A]US2019226656 (TOKO YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE112019003916T (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |