EP4268352 - SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRIC MOTOR, RANGE OF ELECTRIC MOTORS, DEVICE FOR CLOSING, SHADING OR PROTECTING AGAINST THE SUN, COMPRISING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR FROM SUCH A RANGE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somfy Activites SA 50, avenue du Nouveau Monde 74300 Cluses / FR | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRION, Pierre 74300 CLUSES / FR | 02 /
TOLLANCE, Thierry 74300 CLUSES / FR | 03 /
GEORGEAULT, Ronan 74300 CLUSES / FR | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 21844290.3 | 22.12.2021 | [2023/44] | WO2021EP87192 | Priority number, date | FR20200014130 | 24.12.2020 Original published format: FR 2014130 | [2023/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022136496 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4268352 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/16, H02K15/06, E06B9/72 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H02K1/16 (EP);
E06B9/72 (EP);
H02K1/165 (EP);
H02K15/066 (EP);
H02K2213/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER SYNCHRONMOTOR, ELEKTROMOTORREIHE, VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHLIESSEN, VERDUNKELN ODER SONNENSCHUTZ, MIT ELEKTROMOTOR AUS EINEM SOLCHEN PAAR UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2023/44] | English: | SYNCHRONOUS ELECTRIC MOTOR, RANGE OF ELECTRIC MOTORS, DEVICE FOR CLOSING, SHADING OR PROTECTING AGAINST THE SUN, COMPRISING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR FROM SUCH A RANGE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2023/44] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE DE TYPE SYNCHRONE, GAMME DE MOTEURS ÉLECTRIQUES, DISPOSITIF DE FERMETURE, D'OCCULTATION OU DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE COMPRENANT UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE D'UNE TELLE GAMME ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION D'UN MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE D'UNE TELLE GAMME | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 22.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US6396185 (ASAO YOSHIHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * colonne 10, ligne 12 - ligne 29 ; colonne 13, ligne 48 - ligne 52 ; colonne 15, ligne 10 - ligne 45;; figures 1,2, 3, 7, 8, 12 * [Y] 6,8,11-14 [I] 4,5,7,9,10; | [YA]US2007252447 (IONEL DAN M [US], et al) [Y] 8,11 * paragraph [0074] * [A] 1-7,9,10,12-15; | [X]US2014035427 (WOLF GERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0063] , [0064] , [0104] , [0109] , [ 110] , [0112]; figures 1,10,20, 22 *; | [Y]WO2017042487 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) [Y] 6* page 15, line 10 - line 25 *; | [YA]WO2017174523 (SOMFY SAS [FR]) [Y] 12-14 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 5; figures 1-7 * [A] 1-11,15; | [A]EP3261219 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0026] , [0037] - [0041] - [0051]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2018358876 (FATEMI ALIREZA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044]; figures 1,3,4a *; | [A]WO2019234030 (LEROY SOMER MOTEURS [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 9, line 29 - line 32 * | by applicant | WO2017174523 | EP3261219 |