EP4047923 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING CAMERA AND METHOD OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 12.04.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, kwangyong Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
YI, Kyungheum Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KWAK, Seongsin Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Sungoh Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
SHIN, Daekyu Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
CHOE, Jihwan Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 21844605.2 | 22.12.2021 | [2022/34] | WO2021KR19640 | Priority number, date | KR20200180859 | 22.12.2020 Original published format: KR 20200180859 | [2022/34] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022139475 | Date: | 30.06.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047923 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.06.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/225 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H04N23/80 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/667 (EP,KR,US);
G06T5/00 (KR);
H04M1/02 (EP);
H04M1/0264 (KR);
H04N1/2137 (US);
H04N1/215 (US);
H04N23/57 (KR);
H04N23/64 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, DIE EINE KAMERA UMFASST, UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/34] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING CAMERA AND METHOD OF SAME | [2022/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UNE CAMÉRA ET SON PROCÉDÉ | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2022 | Translation filed | 27.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 23.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011193990 (PILLMAN BRUCE H [US], et al); | [Y]US2018367752 (DONSBACH AARON MICHAEL [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR20080106668 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2016052013 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2017041797 (CANON KK); | [Y]KR20170097414 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]JP2019186791 (SHARP KK) |