EP4264844 - METHODS OF EXTENDING TYPE II PORT SELECTION CODEBOOK FOR SUPPORTING HIGHER RANK TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUPASINGHE, Nadisanka Tokyo, 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMURA, Yuki Tokyo, 100-6150 / JP | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 21844926.2 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021US72961 | Priority number, date | US202063127633P | 18.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063127633 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022133471 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4264844 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/0456, H04B7/06, H04B7/08 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04B7/0478 (EP,US);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0486 (EP);
H04B7/063 (EP);
H04B7/0639 (EP);
H04B7/0626 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERWEITERUNG DES TYP-II-PORTAUSWAHLCODEBUCHS ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON ÜBERTRAGUNGEN HÖHERER ORDNUNG | [2023/43] | English: | METHODS OF EXTENDING TYPE II PORT SELECTION CODEBOOK FOR SUPPORTING HIGHER RANK TRANSMISSION | [2023/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'EXTENSION DE LIVRE DE CODES DE SÉLECTION DE PORT DE TYPE II POUR LA PRISE EN CHARGE D'UNE TRANSMISSION DE RANG SUPÉRIEUR | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI] - NOKIA ET AL, "Enhancement on CSI measurement and reporting", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, (20201023), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2008909, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_103-e/Docs/R1-2008909.zip R1-2008909_Rel-17_CSI_enhancements.docx, (20201023), XP051945423 [X] 17 * Sections 1-2; page 1 - page 11 * * figures 1-10; table 1 * [A] 11,13 [Y] 6,8-10,12 [I] 1-5,7,14-16,18 | [IAY] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Discussion on CSI enhancements", vol. RAN WG1, no. e-Meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, (20201023), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2009180, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_103-e/Docs/R1-2009180.zip R1-2009180.docx, (20201023), XP051946885 [I] 1-5,7,11,13,14,16-18 * Section 1; page 1 - page 2 * * Section 3; page 4 - page 10 * [A] 15 [Y] 6,8-10,12 | [YA] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Summary of Further Email discussion for Rel-17 CSI enhancements", vol. RAN WG1, no. E-meeting; 20201026 - 20201113, (20201111), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-2009530, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_103-e/Docs/R1-2009530.zip R1-2009530 Summary of Further Email discussion for Rel-17 CSI enhancements_V52_Mod.docx, (20201111), XP051953496 [Y] 6,8-10 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 37 - page 39 * [A] 1-5,7,11-18 | [A] - "Structure of DFT-based compression", (20191127), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1913604, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_99/Docs/R1-1913604.zip FL summary NR_eMIMO RAN1#99- MUCSI.docx, (20191127), XP051831462 [A] 1-18 * Sections 2.1 and 2.2.; page 1 - page 4 * | by applicant | - "NR; Physical layer procedures for data (Release 16", 3GPP TS 38.214 |