EP4176044 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ACETYL-COA DERIVED PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University 2812 Erwin Road, Suite 406 Durham, NC 27705 / US | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYNCH, Michael, David Durham, North Carolina 27701 / US | 02 /
LI, Shaui Durham, North Carolina 27705 / US | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21845860.2 | 23.07.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021US43023 | Priority number, date | US202063056031P | 24.07.2020 Original published format: US 202063056031 P | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022020748 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176044 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N15/09, C12N15/52, C12N5/10 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/70 (EP,IL,US);
C12P7/44 (US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12N15/635 (US);
C12N9/0006 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/0008 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/0067 (US);
C12N9/1025 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/1029 (EP,IL);
C12Y101/01049 (US);
C12Y102/04001 (US);
C12Y112/07002 (US);
C12Y203/03001 (US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2800/101 (US);
C12N2830/001 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ACETYL-COA-ABGELEITETEN PRODUKTEN | [2023/19] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ACETYL-COA DERIVED PRODUCTS | [2023/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS DÉRIVÉS D'ACÉTYL-COA | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 24.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017165397 (UNIV GEORGIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - WEBB JOSEPH P. ET AL, "Efficient bio-production of citramalate using an engineered Escherichia coli strain", MICROBIOLOGY, Reading, (20180201), vol. 164, no. 2, doi:10.1099/mic.0.000581, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 133 - 141, XP093026261 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.000581 | [Y] - Webb Joseph ET AL, "Systems Analyses Reveal the Resilience of Escherichia coli Physiology during Accumulation and Export of the Nonnative Organic Acid Citramalate", mSystems, United States, doi:10.1128/mSystems.00187-19, (20190611), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6561320/pdf/mSystems.00187-19.pdf, (20240110), XP093117692 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/mSystems.00187-19 | [Y] - PARIMI NAGA SIRISHA ET AL, "Eliminating acetate formation improves citramalate production by metabolically engineered Escherichia coli", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s12934-017-0729-2, (20171201), URL: https://microbialcellfactories.biomedcentral.com/track/pdf/10.1186/s12934-017-0729-2.pdf, XP055901570 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12934-017-0729-2 | [A] - HOSSAIN ABEER H. ET AL, "Identification of novel citramalate biosynthesis pathways in Aspergillus niger", FUNGAL BIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, London, UK, vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s40694-019-0084-7, ISSN 2054-3085, (20191201), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC6862759/pdf/40694_2019_Article_84.pdf, XP093117679 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s40694-019-0084-7 | [XP] - Li Shuai ET AL, "Dynamic control over feedback regulation identifies pyruvate-ferredoxin oxidoreductase as a central metabolic enzyme in stationary phase E. coli", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/2020.07.26.219949, (20200810), URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/2020.07.26.219949v2, (20230807), XP093071135 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/2020.07.26.219949 | [XP] - YE ZHIXIA ET AL, "Two-stage dynamic deregulation of metabolism improves process robustness & scalability in engineered E. coli", METABOLIC ENGINEERING, ACADEMIC PRESS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 68, doi:10.1016/J.YMBEN.2021.09.009, ISSN 1096-7176, (20210930), pages 106 - 118, (20210930), XP086849203 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2021.09.009 | International search | [Y]WO2013184602 (GENOMATICA INC [US], et al) [Y] 8-11 * ; Especially: para [0007], [0098], [00157] *; | [Y]US2014004597 (CHANG MICHELLE C Y [US], et al) [Y] 5 * ; Especially: para [0039] *; | [Y]WO2014057008 (CHALMERS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY RIGHTS AB [SE]) [Y] 1-5,8-14 * ; Especially: p 9, In 19-25; Claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2016053397 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al) [Y] 2-3 * ; Especially: Abstract, para [0007], [0085], [0086] *; | [Y] - SONDEREGGER et al., "Selection of quiescent Escherichia coli with high metabolic activity", Metabolic Engineering, (20050107), vol. 7, doi:10.1016/j.ymben.2004.05.005, pages 4 - 9, XP004753533 [Y] 1-5, 8-14 * ; Especially: Abstract, pg 8, col 1, para 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2004.05.005 | [Y] - Parimi Naga Sirisha, Durie Ian A., Wu Xianghao, Niyas Afaq M. M., Eiteman Mark A., "Eliminating acetate formation improves citramalate production by metabolically engineered Escherichia coli", Microbial Cell Factories, (20171201), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s12934-017-0729-2, XP055901570 [Y] 14 * ; Especially: Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12934-017-0729-2 | [Y] - CHERVAUX et al., "Physiological Study of Lactobacillus delbrueckii subsp. bulgaricus Strains in a Novel Chemically Defined Medium", Applied and Environmental Microbiology, (20001200), vol. 66, no. 12, doi:10.1128/AEM.66.12.5306-5311.2000, pages 5306 - 5311, XP055065341 [Y] 11 * ; Especially: p 5306, col 1, para 2- col 2, para 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.66.12.5306-5311.2000 |