EP4181997 - A PATIENT INTERFACE AND A POSITIONING AND STABILISING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ResMed Pty Ltd 1 Elizabeth Macarthur Drive Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANTANARAYANA, Muditha, Pradeep Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | 02 /
DICKENS, Paul, Andrew Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | 03 /
RUMMERY, Gerard, Michael Bella Vista, New South Wales 2153 / AU | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 21846482.4 | 19.07.2021 | [2023/21] | WO2021AU50775 | Priority number, date | AU20200902500 | 20.07.2020 Original published format: AU 2020902500 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022016213 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4181997 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06, A61M16/08, A61M16/16, A61M16/20 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
A61M16/0683 (EP,AU);
A61M16/0875 (EP,AU,US);
A61M16/0616 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/06 (EP,AU);
A61M16/0666 (EP);
A61M16/0694 (US);
A61M16/0816 (EP,AU);
A61M16/0858 (EP,AU,US);
A61M16/16 (EP);
A61M16/204 (EP);
A61M16/0066 (EP);
A61M16/0075 (EP);
A61M16/0605 (AU);
A61M16/0622 (EP);
A61M16/0633 (EP,AU);
A61M16/0688 (EP);
A61M16/0833 (AU);
A61M16/0866 (AU);
A61M16/1055 (EP);
A61M16/107 (EP);
A61M16/1085 (EP);
A61M16/109 (EP);
A61M16/1095 (EP);
A61M16/20 (EP);
A61M16/203 (AU);
A61M16/208 (AU);
A61M2016/0027 (EP);
A61M2016/003 (EP);
A61M2016/0039 (EP);
A61M2202/0208 (EP);
A61M2202/0225 (EP);
A61M2205/21 (EP);
A61M2205/3317 (EP);
A61M2205/3331 (EP);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,AU,US);
A61M2205/3344 (EP);
A61M2205/3355 (AU);
A61M2205/3365 (EP);
A61M2205/3368 (EP);
A61M2205/3379 (EP);
A61M2205/3553 (EP);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/3653 (EP);
A61M2205/42 (EP);
A61M2205/505 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/582 (EP);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2205/7518 (EP);
A61M2205/8206 (EP);
A61M2209/045 (EP);
A61M2209/086 (EP);
A61M2209/10 (EP);
A61M2210/0618 (EP);
A61M2210/0625 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0208, A61M2202/0007 (EP);
A61M2202/0225, A61M2202/0085 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/21] | A61M16/06, A61M16/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLE UND POSITIONIERUNGS- UND STABILISIERUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2023/21] | English: | A PATIENT INTERFACE AND A POSITIONING AND STABILISING STRUCTURE | [2023/21] | French: | INTERFACE PATIENT ET STRUCTURE DE POSITIONNEMENT ET DE STABILISATION | [2023/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013199537 (FORMICA JUSTIN JOHN [AU], et al); | [A]EP2836265 (TERO ROBERT [US]); | [A]US2017333658 (HAIBACH RICHARD THOMAS [US]); | [A]WO2019119058 (RESMED PTY LTD [AU]) | International search | [XY]US6123071 (BERTHON-JONES MICHAEL [AU], et al); | [XY]US2009133696 (REMMERS JOHN E [CA], et al); | [Y]US2010252037 (WONDKA ANTHONY D [US], et al); | [A]US2013190643 (BRAMBILLA ENRICO [US]); | [Y]US2013340759 (BERTHON-JONES MICHAEL [AU], et al); | [XY]US2014026889 (SHER BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]US2016074614 (HUDDART BRETT JOHN [NZ], et al); | [XY]US2017246414 (BAHAMMAM AHMED SALEM O [SA]); | [XY]US2017312468 (FORMICA JUSTIN JOHN [AU], et al); | [A]WO2018124889 (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ]); | [Y]US2018236197 (FLOWER RENEE FRANCES [AU], et al) |