EP4201958 - ANTI-CTLA-4 ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Junshi Biosciences Co., Ltd. Floor 13, Building 2 Nos. 36 and 58, Haiqu Road Pilot Free Trade Zone Shanghai 201210 / CN | For all designated states Suzhou Junmeng Biosciences Co., Ltd. East of Changan Road Wujiang Economic and Technological Development Zone Suzhou, Jiangsu 215002 / CN | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Zhiwei Suzhou, Jiangsu 215002 / CN | 02 /
YAO, Jian Shanghai 201210 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Jing Suzhou, Jiangsu 215002 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Yuehua Suzhou, Jiangsu 215002 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Hongchuan Suzhou, Jiangsu 215002 / CN | 06 /
WU, Hai Shanghai 201210 / CN | 07 /
YAO, Sheng Shanghai 201210 / CN | 08 /
FENG, Hui Suzhou, Jiangsu 215002 / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21846885.8 | 21.07.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021CN107707 | Priority number, date | CN202010708105 | 21.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010708105 | [2023/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022017428 | Date: | 27.01.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201958 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.01.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/00, C12N15/13, C12P21/08, G01N33/577, C12N15/85 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
C07K16/2818 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K2039/545 (EP);
C07K2299/00 (EP);
C07K2317/20 (US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP);
C07K2317/34 (EP);
C07K2317/622 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | ANTI-CTLA-4-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2023/26] | English: | ANTI-CTLA-4 ANTIBODY AND USE THEREOF | [2023/26] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-CTLA-4 ET SON UTILISATION | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2023 | Translation filed | 13.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |