EP4169780 - JUMP PRESSURE LIMITING MECHANISM AND AIR BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meishan CRRC Brake Science & Technology Co., Ltd. No. 68 Science & Technology Industrial Park 3 Road Meishan City, Sichuan 620010 / CN | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Jinlong Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, Chen Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 03 /
LV, Chao Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Yi Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Baohua Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 06 /
SHEN, Yanfei Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 07 /
YANG, Jianping Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 08 /
NING, Bo Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 09 /
LI, Guo Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 10 /
SONG, Zhiyong Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 11 /
WANG, Kaien Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | 12 /
TANG, Qi Meishan Sichuan 620010 / CN | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21847669.5 | 30.09.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021CN122242 | Priority number, date | CN20211169889 | 13.09.2021 Original published format: CN202111069889 | [2023/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023035344 | Date: | 16.03.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169780 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4169780 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.03.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/34, B60T13/38, F16K17/34, G05D16/10, B60T15/50 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B60T15/024 (EP);
B60T13/385 (CN);
B60T15/021 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRUNGDRUCKBEGRENZUNGSMECHANISMUS UND LUFTBREMSSYSTEM | [2023/17] | English: | JUMP PRESSURE LIMITING MECHANISM AND AIR BRAKE SYSTEM | [2023/17] | French: | MÉCANISME DE LIMITATION DE PRESSION DE SAUT ET SYSTÈME DE FREIN PNEUMATIQUE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2022 | Translation filed | 01.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 30.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB850052 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL, et al); | [A]US3727994 (KELLER S); | [A]DE2514257 (OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG); | [A]US2008047619 (PECHTOLD RAINER [DE]); | [A]KR101313802B (JUEUN MACHINERY & IND CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2018170339 (PLECHEY MICHAEL S [US], et al) |