EP4264873 - PRIVACY-ENHANCED COMPUTATION VIA SEQUESTERED ENCRYPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | 23.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agita Labs, Inc. 201 South Division Street, Suite 400 Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUSTIN, Todd, M. Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | 02 /
BERTACCO, Valeria Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | 03 /
KISIL, Alexander Ann Arbor, MI 48104 / US | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/43] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21847824.6 | 17.12.2021 | [2023/43] | WO2021US63946 | Priority number, date | US202063127183P | 18.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063127183 P | US202163221594P | 14.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163221594 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022133164 | Date: | 23.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4264873 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00, H04L9/06, H04L9/08 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04L9/0894 (EP,KR);
H04L9/003 (EP,KR);
G06F21/72 (US);
G06F21/62 (US);
G06F21/76 (KR,US);
H04L63/0442 (US);
H04L9/0618 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/0631 (US);
H04L9/0643 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | DATENSCHUTZVERBESSERTE BERECHNUNG DURCH SEQUESTRIERTE VERSCHLÜSSELUNG | [2023/43] | English: | PRIVACY-ENHANCED COMPUTATION VIA SEQUESTERED ENCRYPTION | [2023/43] | French: | CALCUL À CONFIDENTIALITÉ AMÉLIORÉE PAR CHIFFREMENT SÉQUESTRÉ | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 11.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |