EP4277496 - SELF-ADHESIVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMINIKAT, Udo 24999 Wees / DE | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 21847936.8 | 14.12.2021 | [2023/47] | WO2021EP85778 | Priority number, date | DE202110200334 | 15.01.2021 Original published format: DE102021200334 | [2023/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022152489 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4277496 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/06, A47G1/17, A47B96/02 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
A47B96/067 (EP);
A47B96/027 (EP);
A47G1/175 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | SELBSTKLEBENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/47] | English: | SELF-ADHESIVE DEVICE | [2023/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF AUTO-ADHÉSIF | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 16.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2001028022 (HAMERSKI MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [XA]WO2005046938 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [A]US2008053931 (NEWBOULD PETER J [IT], et al) | by applicant | EP0861622 |