EP4252221 - MANAGING A FLEET OF AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES BASED ON COLLECTED INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wing Aviation LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / CA | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TELLES, Bernardo, Malta, Leite Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
NEGRON, Reinaldo, Jr. Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21848215.6 | 16.12.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021US63902 | Priority number, date | US202117151057 | 15.01.2021 Original published format: US202117151057 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022154935 | Date: | 21.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4252221 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, G08G5/02, G08G5/04 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G05D1/104 (US);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G05D1/106 (US);
G08G5/0034 (EP);
G08G5/0039 (EP,US);
G08G5/0043 (EP);
G08G5/0056 (EP);
G08G5/006 (EP);
G08G5/0069 (EP);
G08G5/0086 (EP);
G08G5/025 (EP,US);
G08G5/045 (EP);
B64U10/20 (EP,US);
B64U2101/15 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG EINER FLOTTE VON AUTONOMEN FAHRZEUGEN AUF BASIS GESAMMELTER INFORMATIONEN | [2023/40] | English: | MANAGING A FLEET OF AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES BASED ON COLLECTED INFORMATION | [2023/40] | French: | GESTION D'UNE FLOTTE DE VÉHICULES AUTONOMES SUR LA BASE D'INFORMATIONS COLLECTÉES | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 29.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2017178520 (PAPAGEORGIOU GEORGE [FR], et al); | [X]US2018181125 (CECCOM CHRISTOPHE [FR]); | [A]US2019317530 (YANG BINGZHEN [CN], et al); | [XYI]US2019355263 (PRIEST LEE [US]); | [Y]US2020020236 (ZHOU HONGZHU [CN], et al); | [X]US2020380873 (BOELENS JAN-HENDRIK [DE], et al) |