EP4271509 - MOLECULAR ARRAYS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING AND USING THE ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.07.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | 01.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 10X Genomics, Inc. 6230 Stoneridge Mall Road Pleasanton, CA 94588-3260 / US | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCDERMOTT, Geoffrey Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | 02 /
PATTERSON, David Michael Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | 03 /
PRICE, Andrew D. Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | 04 /
RAMACHANDRAN IYER, Eswar Prasad Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | 05 /
SCHNALL-LEVIN, Michael Pleasanton, California 94588-3260 / US | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 21848455.8 | 29.12.2021 | [2023/45] | WO2021US65525 | Priority number, date | US202063132379P | 30.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063132379 P | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022147134 | Date: | 07.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4271509 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, C12Q1/6834 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6834 (EP);
C12Q1/6837 (US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
B01J2219/00549 (EP);
B01J2219/00659 (EP);
B01J2219/00711 (EP);
B01J2219/00722 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2523/319, C12Q2525/101, C12Q2525/186, C12Q2537/149 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | MOLEKULARE ARRAYS UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND VERWENDUNG DER ARRAYS | [2023/45] | English: | MOLECULAR ARRAYS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING AND USING THE ARRAYS | [2023/45] | French: | RÉSEAUX MOLÉCULAIRES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR GÉNÉRER ET UTILISER DES RÉSEAUX | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 26.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015148239 (PETER BRIAN JON [US], et al) [Y] 1-138 * see whole doc. esp. claims and par. 40 ff and par. 79 ff. *; | [A]EP2878671 (LSI MEDIENCE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-138 * see esp. claims *; | [A]WO2020047007 (10X GENOMICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-138* see whole doc., esp. claims *; | [Y]WO2020236992 (INSILIXA INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-138 * see whole doc. esp. claims 78 ff and 100ff and Figures 8-13, par. 159 * | by applicant | US5472881 | US5610287 | US5807522 | US5837860 | US6737236 | US7259258 | US7264929 | US7309593 | US7375234 | US7427678 | US2008280773 | US2011059865 | US2011143967 | US2020384436 | US2021017127 | - SHALON et al., Genome Research, (19960000), pages 639 - 645 | - ROGERS et al., Analytical Biochemistry, (19990000), vol. 266, pages 23 - 30 | - STIMPSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19950000), vol. 92, pages 6379 - 6383 | - BEATTIE et al., Clin. Chem., (19950000), vol. 45, pages 700 - 706 | - LAMTURE et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19940000), vol. 22, pages 5456 - 5465 | - BEIER, Nucleic Acids Research, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 1970 - 1977 | - JOOS et al., Analytical Biochemistry, (19970000), vol. 247, pages 96 - 101 | - NIKIFOROV et al., Analytical Biochemistry, (19950000), vol. 227, pages 201 - 209 | - TIMOFEEV et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19960000), vol. 24, pages 3031 - 3039 | - RUNNINGURDEA, BioTechniques, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 276 - 279 | - FAHY et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19930000), vol. 21, pages 1819 - 1826 | - ROGERS et al., Gene Therapy, (19970000), vol. 4, pages 1387 - 1392 | - KLAN et al., Chem. Rev., (20130000), vol. 113, no. 1, pages 119 - 91 | - LIUDEITERS, Acc. Chem. Res., (20140000), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 45 - 55 | - IKEDAKABUMOTO, Chem. Letters, (20170000), vol. 46, no. 5, pages 634 - 640 |