EP4191994 - IMAGE DETERMINATION METHOD AND IMAGE DETERMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cyberware Inc. 42, Kagurazaka 6-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-0825 / JP | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAKUBO, Kosuke Tokyo 162-0825 / JP | 02 /
HIRAKA, Takafumi Tokyo 162-0825 / JP | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21851010.5 | 12.07.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021JP26194 | Priority number, date | JP20200127474 | 28.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020127474 | [2023/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022024739 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191994 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V40/40, G06F21/32, G06V10/143, G06V40/16, H04N23/611, H04N23/71, H04N23/74 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
H04N23/74 (EP);
G06F21/32 (EP);
G06V10/143 (EP);
G06V40/172 (EP);
G06V40/40 (EP);
H04N23/611 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | H04N5/232, G06T7/00, G06T7/586, H04N5/225 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | BILDBESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDBESTIMMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/23] | English: | IMAGE DETERMINATION METHOD AND IMAGE DETERMINATION DEVICE | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'IMAGE | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2023 | Translation filed | 28.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1703439 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [X] 1,7,9,13-15 * paragraphs [0039] , [0046] , [0054] , [0069]; figures 4-8 * [A] 2-6,8,10-12; | [YA]US2012134547 (JUNG HO CHOUL [KR]) [Y] 2,4-6,8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0027] , [0039]; figures 2,5 *[A] 1,3,7,9-15; | [IAY]EP2680192 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [I] 1,9-15 * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] - [0101] , [0105] , [0125] , [0126]; figure 15 * [A] 2-7 [Y] 8; | [XAY]US2018096212 (LIN JUNSUI [CN]) [X] 1,7,9,13-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0032] , [0054] - [0075] - [0130] - [0138] - [0159]; figures 1,4,6,8 * [A] 3,8,10-12 [Y] 2,4-6 | International search | [Y]JP2006099614 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 11-12* claim 11, paragraph [0053] *; | [YAX]JP2006259923 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [Y] 2, 4, 7, 10-12 [A] 3, 5, 8 [X] 1, 6, 9, 13-15; | [Y]JP2012113687 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 2, 4, 7, 10-12 * paragraphs [0003], [0012]-[0013] * | by applicant | WO2019017080 |