EP4095693 - DATA PACKET SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [2024/38] |
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Kun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
XU, Guopei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21851414.9 | 17.06.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021CN100479 | Priority number, date | CN202010760504 | 31.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010760504 | [2022/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022022140 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095693 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4095693 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54, A63F13/35, A63F13/31, G06F15/173 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A63F13/31 (EP);
G06F9/5027 (CN);
A63F13/35 (EP,CN,US);
G06F15/17325 (EP);
G06F9/546 (EP,CN,US);
A63F2300/53 (EP);
G06F2209/5018 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | G06F9/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENPAKETSYNCHRONISATIONSVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT, VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/48] | English: | DATA PACKET SYNCHRONIZATION METHOD AND APPARATUS, DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SYNCHRONISATION DE PAQUETS DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2022 | Translation filed | 23.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 20.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]CN111013133 (BEIJING QIYI CENTURY SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [IA]CN111282263 (BEIJING QIYI CENTURY SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) |