EP4180984 - FILE SHARING METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Digital Currency Institute, The People's Bank of China Floor 20, Building A, Jintang Center 18 Fengtai North Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100166 / CN | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MU, Changchun Beijing 100166 / CN | 02 /
DI, Gang Beijing 100166 / CN | 03 /
QIAN, Youcai Beijing 100166 / CN | 04 /
QING, Sude Beijing 100166 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Qingjie Beijing 100166 / CN | 06 /
DU, Jinzhao Beijing 100166 / CN | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21852328.0 | 04.08.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021CN110599 | Priority number, date | CN202010772425 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010772425 | CN202010772432 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010772432 | CN202010772434 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010772434 | CN202010773252 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010773252 | [2023/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028486 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4180984 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/176, H04L9/00 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
G06F16/176 (EP,US);
G06F16/1744 (US);
G06F21/64 (EP);
H04L9/0643 (US);
H04L9/3239 (EP);
H04L9/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/20] | G06F16/176 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Title | German: | DATEITEILUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2023/20] | English: | FILE SHARING METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE PARTAGE DE FICHIERS | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2023 | Translation filed | 09.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |