EP4193202 - LIGHT INCOUPLING TAPE, RELATED METHOD AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Kozo Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
MIYATAKE, Minoru Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
WENG, Yufeng Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
RINKO, Kari 00140 Helsinki / FI | 05 /
MATSUMOTO, Shingo Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0033 / JP | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21852446.0 | 04.08.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021JP28954 | Priority number, date | JP20200134107 | 06.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020134107 | [2023/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022030543 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4193202 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00, F21S2/00, F21V8/00 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
G02B6/0025 (EP);
G02B6/0055 (US);
G02B6/0016 (US);
G02B6/002 (US);
G02B6/0026 (US);
G02B6/0065 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | LICHTEINKOPPLUNGSBAND, ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN | [2023/24] | English: | LIGHT INCOUPLING TAPE, RELATED METHOD AND USES | [2023/24] | French: | RUBAN DE COUPLAGE D'ENTRÉE DE LUMIÈRE, PROCÉDÉ ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010085750 (VAN OSTRAND DANIEL K [US], et al) | International search | [A]JPH10111511 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]US2010061101 (VAN PIETERSON LIESBETH [NL], et al); | [A]CN202813209U (LIU JUNBO); | [Y]JP2017107174 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [YX]WO2019182098 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) |