EP4174989 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | For all designated states Lg Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Na Ri Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Young Su Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Woo Hyun Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Sang Soon Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
CHAE, Hwa Seok Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Hyun Uk Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Dong Jin Daejeon 34122 / KR | 08 /
KANG, Dong Ryoung Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 21852462.7 | 06.08.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021KR10427 | Priority number, date | KR20200098736 | 06.08.2020 Original published format: KR 20200098736 | [2023/18] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022031116 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174989 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/525, H01M4/505, H01M4/36, C01G53/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
C01G53/006 (EP,KR);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
C01G53/04 (EP);
C01G53/42 (EP);
C01G53/44 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/0471 (US);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/1391 (EP);
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/366 (EP,KR);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/60 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2006/40 (EP,KR);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIALVORLÄUFER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/18] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL PRECURSOR AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2023/18] | French: | PRÉCURSEUR DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2023 | Translation filed | 25.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]KR100752703B (IUCF HYU [KR]) [Y] 1,3-11,13-16 * See claims 1 and 10; and pages 9 and 10. *; | [A]KR20130063868 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16* See entire document. *; | [A]KR20150076425 (POSCO [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * See entire document. *; | [A]KR20180104837 (DRB HOLDING CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16 * See entire document. *; | [YA]KR20200071989 (KOREA NATIONAL UNIV OF TRANSPORTATION INDUSTRY ACADEMIC COOPERATION FOUNDATION [KR]) [Y] 1,3-11,13-16 * See claims 1 and 3; and paragraph [0046]. * [A] 2,12 | by applicant | KR20200098736 |