EP4187960 - DETERMINISTIC TRANSMISSION METHOD, COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YING, Jiangwei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Yanmei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21853985.6 | 07.06.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021CN98743 | Priority number, date | CN202010774757 | 04.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010774757 | [2023/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028087 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187960 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W28/02, // H04W8/24, H04W28/16 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04W28/0215 (EP);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W72/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/535 (CN);
H04W72/542 (US);
H04W72/543 (EP,CN);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04W76/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | DETERMINISTISCHES ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/22] | English: | DETERMINISTIC TRANSMISSION METHOD, COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DÉTERMINISTE, APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2023 | Translation filed | 22.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 29.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2020104946 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [XAYI]WO2020150333 (TALEBI FARD PEYMAN [US], et al); | International search | [A]WO2019166081 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | [X]WO2020036911 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al); | [A]CN110876159 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); |