EP4170307 - PRESSURE SENSOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Wei Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21854602.6 | 05.08.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021CN110833 | Priority number, date | CN202010788347 | 07.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010788347 | [2023/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022028525 | Date: | 10.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4170307 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/18, G01L1/22, G01L1/26 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
G01L1/2262 (EP,US);
G01L1/18 (CN);
G01L1/2281 (US);
G01L1/2287 (US);
G01L1/26 (EP);
G01L5/22 (US);
H05K1/0277 (US);
H05K1/181 (US);
H05K2201/09545 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/17] | G01L1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | DRUCKSENSOR UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/17] | English: | PRESSURE SENSOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/17] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2023 | Translation filed | 19.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 22.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019041281 (LI HAO [CN]); | [A]US2019368952 (LI HAO [CN]) |