EP3999447 - CARRIER FOR CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, LLC. Law Department-9th Floor 1500 Riveredge Parkway, Suite 100 Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCREE, Justin Keynsham, Bristol BS311JA / GB | 02 /
GOULD, Steve, M. Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS348XX / GB | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 21854802.2 | 28.09.2021 | [2022/21] | WO2021US52278 | Priority number, date | US202063085365P | 30.09.2020 Original published format: US 202063085365 P | US202063086681P | 02.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063086681 P | US202063120863P | 03.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063120863 P | US202163136400P | 12.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163136400 P | US202163208646P | 09.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163208646 P | [2022/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022072298 | Date: | 07.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3999447 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3999447 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.04.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/72, B65D71/42, B65D73/00 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
B65D71/42 (EP,KR,US);
B65D71/72 (KR,US);
B31B50/20 (KR,US);
B31B50/262 (KR,US);
B31B50/86 (KR,US);
B31B2100/00 (KR,US);
B65D2571/00141 (EP,KR,US);
B65D2571/00259 (KR,US);
B65D2571/00277 (EP);
B65D2571/0029 (KR,US);
B65D2571/00327 (EP);
B65D2571/00444 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGER FÜR BEHÄLTER | [2022/21] | English: | CARRIER FOR CONTAINERS | [2022/21] | French: | SUPPORT POUR CONTENANTS | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5328024 (SUTHERLAND ROBERT L [US]); | [A]US5490593 (GORDON ROBERT L [US], et al); | [XAI]KR20200106806 (MODUMOA CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [Y]WO9325439 (RIVERWOOD INT CORP [US]); | [Y]US5490593 (GORDON ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US5553704 (GORDON ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]JP2004189243 (TOMOKU CO LTD); | [XY]KR20200106806 (MODUMOA CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US8096413 | US8387784 | US11027905 |