EP4249647 - ELECTROLYTIC MEDIUM, ELECTROPOLISHING PROCESS USING SUCH ELECTROLYTIC MEDIUM AND DEVICE TO CARRY IT OUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Drylyte, S.L. C/. Salvador Alarma nº 16 08035 Barcelona / ES | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARSANEDAS GIMPERA, Marc 17800 OLOT (Girona) / ES | 02 /
ROMAGOSA CALATAYUD, Pau 43350 LES BORGES DEL CAMP (Tarragona) / ES | 03 /
PEREZ PLANAS, Miguel, Francisco 08440 CARDEDEU (Barcelona) / ES | 04 /
GUTIERREZ CASTILLO, Joan, David 08840 VILADECANS (Barcelona) / ES | 05 /
SOTO HERNANDEZ, Marc 08105 SANT FOST DE CAMPSENTELLES (Barcelona) / ES | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Espiell Gomez, Ignacio R. Volart Pons y Cia., S.L. Pau Claris, 77 2º 1ª 08010 Barcelona / ES | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21854809.7 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021ES70864 | Priority number, date | EP20200383069 | 09.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20383069 | [2023/39] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022123096 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | ES | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4249647 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25F3/16, C25F7/00 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
C25F3/16 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C25F7/00 (EP,IL,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTISCHES MEDIUM, ELEKTROPOLIERVERFAHREN MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ELEKTROLYTISCHEN MEDIUM UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DESSEN DURCHFÜHRUNG | [2023/39] | English: | ELECTROLYTIC MEDIUM, ELECTROPOLISHING PROCESS USING SUCH ELECTROLYTIC MEDIUM AND DEVICE TO CARRY IT OUT | [2023/39] | French: | MILIEU ÉLECTROLYTIQUE, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLECTROPOLISSAGE FAISANT APPEL À CET MILIEU ÉLECTROLYTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2023 | Translation filed | 20.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.07.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 17.07.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP3372711 (DRYLYTE SL [ES]) [X] 11-13 * the whole document *; | [X]ES2754876 (STEROS GPA INNOVATIVE S L [ES]) [X] 11,14,15* the whole document *; | [A]ES2756948 (DRYLYTE SL [ES]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | ES2604830 | ES2721170 | ES2734415 | ES2734500 |