EP4124070 - ACOUSTIC DEVICE AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PROTECTIVE COMPONENT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Shokz Co., Ltd. Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26 Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2023/04] | For all designated states Shenzhen Shokz Co., Ltd. Floors 1-4, Factory Building 26 Shancheng Industrial Park Shiyan Street, Bao'an District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518108 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chaowu Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Shuailin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | 03 /
FU, Junjiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518108 / CN | [2023/04] | Representative(s) | Wang, Bo Panovision IP Ebersberger Straße 3 85570 Markt Schwaben / DE | [2023/04] | Application number, filing date | 21855137.2 | 29.04.2021 | [2023/04] | WO2021CN91115 | Priority number, date | CN202021688900U | 12.08.2020 Original published format: CN 202021688900 U | CN202010808757 | 12.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010808757 | [2023/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022033081 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4124070 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H04R1/02, H04R1/10, H04R31/00 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04R1/023 (EP,US);
H04R25/65 (KR,US);
H04R1/10 (KR);
H04R1/1075 (EP);
H04R25/604 (EP,KR);
H04R1/1008 (EP);
H04R2420/07 (EP);
H04R2460/13 (EP,KR);
H04R25/606 (EP);
H04R31/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/04] | H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/04] | Title | German: | AKUSTISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE SCHUTZKOMPONENTE DAVON | [2023/04] | English: | ACOUSTIC DEVICE AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PROTECTIVE COMPONENT THEREOF | [2023/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ACOUSTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT DE PROTECTION ASSOCIÉ | [2023/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2022 | Translation filed | 17.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/04] | 19.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20080003627 (IFEELU INC [KR]) [Y] 3,6-9 * the whole document *; | [IY]JP2013085198 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO, et al) [I] 15 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12; | [XYI]EP3337185 (SHENZHEN VOXTECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,5,13,14 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0078]; figures 9, 12, 14-A, 20, 23, 30 * [Y] 3,6-9,11,12 [I] 7,8,10; | [Y]US2018270555 (MAO LINJIN [CN], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *; | [XP]CN212851008U (SHENZHEN VOXTECH LTD CORPORATION) [XP] 1,15* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN202713590U (MENGSHENG HOT MELT CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * entire document *; | [Y]CN205336486U (SHENZHEN VOXTECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-14 * description, paragraphs [0037]-[0049], and figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2019124427 (LUCIGNANO CARMINE [IT], et al) [A] 1-15* entire document *; | [YX]CN110650385 (GOERTEK INC) [Y] 1-14 * description, paragraphs [0055]-[0065], and figures 3-4 * [X] 15; | [PX]CN112087700 (SHENZHEN VOXTECH LTD CORPORATION) [PX] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0033]-[0078], and figures 1-10 *; | [PX]CN212851007U (SHENZHEN VOXTECH LTD CORPORATION) [PX] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0031]-[0076], and figures 1-10 *; | [PX]CN212851008U (SHENZHEN VOXTECH LTD CORPORATION) [PX] 1-15 * description, paragraphs [0032]-[0077], and figures 1-10 * |