EP4199259 - REGISTRATION REQUEST RESPONSE METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Weiliang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YUAN, Liquan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
WEI, Junshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Xingang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21855348.5 | 26.07.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021CN108471 | Priority number, date | CN202010820520 | 14.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010820520 | [2023/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022033295 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199259 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0067 (EP,CN,US);
H04Q2011/0064 (EP);
H04Q2011/0086 (CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | H01Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REAKTION AUF REGISTRIERUNGSANFRAGEN | [2023/25] | English: | REGISTRATION REQUEST RESPONSE METHOD AND DEVICE | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉPONSE À UNE DEMANDE D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2023 | Translation filed | 22.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2020062938 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-4,6,9-12 * the whole document * [I] 5,7,8; | [A] - YUANQIU LUO FUTUREWEI TECHNOLOGIES USA, "Higher Speed Passive Optical Networks: Common Transmission Convergence Layer Specification", vol. 2/15, (20200729), pages 1 - 221, ITU-T DRAFT; STUDY PERIOD 2017-2020; STUDY GROUP 15, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, URL: https://www.itu.int/ifa/t/2017/sg15/exchange/wp1/q2/G.hsp.ComTC-editing/G.hsp.comTC_draft-20200804.docx, (20200729), XP044292209 [A] 1-12 * 6.1.5.7 Allocation identifier (Alloc-ID); (page 14) 8.1.1.2.1 Alloc-ID field; (page 30) 11.3.3.7 Assign-Alloc-ID message; (page 75) 11.3.4.1 Serial_Number_ONU message; (pg. 87) Table 11-24 12 ONU activation; (page 96) 12.1.5 OLT support of ONU activation; (page 113) * |