EP4198606 - CONTROL DEVICE, IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Nobuya Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
SONODA, Shinichiro Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIZAWA, Hirotoshi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21855810.4 | 07.06.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021JP21594 | Priority number, date | JP20200136473 | 12.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020136473 | [2023/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022034731 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198606 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/08, G02B26/10, G09G3/02, G09G3/34, G09G3/20 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
G09G3/346 (EP);
G02B26/101 (EP,US);
G02B26/0833 (EP);
G02B26/085 (US);
G02B26/105 (US);
G09G3/025 (EP);
G09G2320/0233 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | G02B26/10, G09G3/02, G09G3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND STEUERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2023/25] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE, IMAGE FORMATION DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD, AND CONTROL PROGRAM | [2023/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE, DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2023 | Translation filed | 26.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 20.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004218155 (SCHENK HARALD [DE], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2004302104 (NIPPON SIGNAL CO LTD, et al); | [XYA]US2004218155 (SCHENK HARALD [DE], et al); | [A]US2015286048 (CHEN CHUNG-DE [TW], et al); | [A]US2018281107 (DÜRR MATTHIAS [DE]) | by applicant | JP2005526289 | JP2019082634 | JP2020136473 |