EP4200115 - IMPROVEMENTS IN SCREENING PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schenck Process Australia Pty Limited 65 Epping Road North Ryde, NSW 2113 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | For all designated states Schenck Process Australia Pty Ltd. 65 Epping Road North Ryde NSW 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSTONE, Aidan Paul North Ryde, 2113 / AU | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21857033.1 | 13.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021AU50893 | Priority number, date | AU20200902955 | 19.08.2020 Original published format: AU 2020902955 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022036390 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200115 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/14, B07B1/04, B07B1/46, B29C45/16, B29K705/00, B29L31/00 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
B07B1/4618 (EP,US);
B07B1/4645 (EP,AU,US);
B07B1/4663 (EP);
B29C45/14778 (EP);
B29C45/14819 (AU,US);
B29K2705/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | B29C45/14, B07B1/04, B07B1/46, B29C45/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNGEN AN SIEBPLATTEN | [2023/26] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN SCREENING PANELS | [2023/26] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS À DES PANNEAUX DE CRIBLAGE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4374169 (GRYSKIEWICZ GREGORY A, et al); | [A]US4674251 (WOLFF KURT [DE]); | [A]US2011151178 (STACKPOLE BENJAMIN [US]); | [A]CA3069383 (THYSSENKRUPP IND SOLUTIONS AG [DE], et al) |