EP4187736 - POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Digital Power Technologies Co., Ltd. Office 01, 39th Floor, Block A Antuoshan Headquarters Towers 33 Antuoshan 6th Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518043 / CN | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Dong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CAO, Zhen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Yongquan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
YAO, Xiaofeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 21857617.1 | 16.08.2021 | [2023/22] | WO2021CN112746 | Priority number, date | CN202010839416 | 19.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010839416 | [2023/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022037522 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187736 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/10, H02M3/158, H02J7/00, H02M1/00, H02M3/156 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H02M1/0093 (EP);
H02J1/10 (CN);
H02J7/35 (US);
H02J1/102 (EP,CN);
H02J1/106 (EP);
H02J3/002 (US);
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02M3/156 (EP);
H02M3/158 (CN);
H02J2207/20 (EP);
H02J2300/22 (EP);
H02J2300/26 (US);
H02M1/0077 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/22] | H02J1/10, H02M3/158 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2023/22] | English: | POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2023/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2023 | Translation filed | 22.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013026842 (ARDITI SHMUEL [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,13-15 * paragraphs [0239] - [0279]; figures 34-38 * [I] 7-10,12; | [XI]US2013193765 (YOSCOVICH ILAN [IL]) [X] 1,5,6,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0049]; figures 3a-3c, 4 *[I] 2-4,7-10,12 |