EP4202625 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, AND MAGNETIC TAPE CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OISHI, Yutaka Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Michitaka Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | 03 /
UNO, Yuko Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21858025.6 | 11.06.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021JP22332 | Priority number, date | JP20200140420 | 21.08.2020 Original published format: JP 2020140420 | JP20200193236 | 20.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020193236 | [2023/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022038874 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202625 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F11/20, G06F13/10, G06F13/14, G06F16/13, G11B5/008, G11B27/00, G11B27/10 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G11B27/002 (EP);
G06F3/0631 (EP,US);
G06F16/13 (EP);
G06F3/0604 (EP,US);
G06F3/0665 (EP);
G06F3/0686 (EP,US);
G11B27/107 (EP);
G06F11/2094 (EP);
G06F3/065 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | G06F3/06, G06F11/20, G06F13/10, G06F13/14, G06F16/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM UND MAGNETBANDKASSETTE | [2023/26] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, AND MAGNETIC TAPE CARTRIDGE | [2023/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET CARTOUCHE DE BANDE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2023 | Translation filed | 20.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 15.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006294336 (GIBBLE KEVIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010257140 (DAVIS PHILIP JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011119441 (PEAKE JONATHAN W [US], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [I]US2012127606 (STARR MATTHEW THOMAS [US]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US8255704 (JOH JENNIFER [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2006294336 (GIBBLE KEVIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0020]-[0028], fig. 1-2 *; | [A]US2015033224 (MAHESHWARI NILESH P [US], et al) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0069] * | by applicant | JP2008250667 | JP2010108341 | JP2020140420 | JP2020193236 |