EP4190975 - METHOD FOR WARNING DRIVERS ABOUT THE PRESENCE OF A PEDESTRIAN ON A PEDESTRIAN CROSSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirillov, Aleksandr Viktorovich Novocheremushkinskaya Ulitsa, dom 11k1, kv. 55 Moscow 117447 / RU | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRILLOV, Viktor Nikolayevich Tomilino 140070 / RU | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Ilieva, Angelina Stanimirova 2 Nikolay Haytov Str., ent. G, fl. 5, Apt. 13 1113 Sofia / BG | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21858696.4 | 10.08.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021RU50255 | Priority number, date | RU20200127798 | 20.08.2020 Original published format: RU 2020127798 | [2023/23] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022039633 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | RU | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190975 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/095, E01F9/608, E01F9/696, G08G1/04, G08G1/052, G08G1/123, G08G1/16, G01S13/04, G08G1/005, G01S7/41, G01S13/56, G01S13/72, G01S13/91 | [2024/44] | CPC: |
G08G1/095 (EP);
E01F9/615 (RU);
G08G1/09 (US);
E01F9/696 (EP);
G01S13/91 (EP);
G08G1/005 (EP,RU,US);
G08G1/04 (EP);
G08G1/052 (US);
G08G1/16 (RU);
G08G1/164 (EP);
G08G1/166 (US);
G01S13/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | E01F9/608, E01F9/696, G08G1/04, G08G1/052, G08G1/123 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WARNUNG VON FAHRERN VOR DEM VORLIEGEN EINES FUSSGÄNGERS AUF EINEM FUSSGÄNGERÜBERGANG | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD FOR WARNING DRIVERS ABOUT THE PRESENCE OF A PEDESTRIAN ON A PEDESTRIAN CROSSING | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AVERTISSEMENT DE CONDUCTEURS CONCERNANT LA PRÉSENCE D'UN PIÉTON SUR UN PASSAGE PIÉTON | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2023 | Translation filed | 11.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EA201001487 ; | [A]KR101045569B (SEOYEON NETWORKS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN207517195U (LI YIJIN) | by applicant | EP3336822 |