EP4200849 - CIRCUITS AND METHODS FOR SELF-ADAPTIVE DECISION-FEEDBACK EQUALIZATION A MEMORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 4453 N First Street, Suite 100 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULLER, Andrew, M. San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
DALY, Barry, William San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 03 /
GIOVANNINI, Thomas, J. San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 04 /
LUO, Lei San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 05 /
HOSSAIN, Masum Edmonton / CA | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 21858815.0 | 06.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021US44932 | Priority number, date | US202063067716P | 19.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063067716 P | US202063126308P | 16.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063126308 P | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022039945 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200849 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/10, G11C7/02, G11C29/02, G11C5/04 | [2024/44] | CPC: |
G11C5/04 (EP);
G06F12/0223 (US);
G11C11/4082 (US);
G11C29/022 (EP);
G11C29/028 (EP);
G11C7/02 (EP);
G11C7/1057 (EP);
G11C7/1066 (EP);
G11C7/1084 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/26] | G11C7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR SELBSTADAPTIVEN ENTSCHEIDUNGSRÜCKGEKOPPELTEN ENTZERRUNG EINES SPEICHERSYSTEMS | [2023/26] | English: | CIRCUITS AND METHODS FOR SELF-ADAPTIVE DECISION-FEEDBACK EQUALIZATION A MEMORY SYSTEM | [2023/26] | French: | CIRCUITS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ÉGALISATION À DÉCISION RÉTROACTIVE AUTO-ADAPTATIVE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2012063242 (KIM DAE-HYUN [KR], et al); | [Y]US8416846 (LIN ANDREW [US], et al); | [Y]US2018136866 (EUGENIO DEAN-DEXTER R [US], et al) |