EP4200885 - HYBRID CAPACITOR WITH IMPROVED ESR STABILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemet Electronics Corporation One East Broward Blvd., 5th Floor Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDORALOV, Victor 7005-639 Évora / PT | 02 /
PAIS, Vania 7005-639 Évora / PT | 03 /
SÁ, Débora 7005-639 Évora / PT | 04 /
EVARISTO, Miguel 7005-639 Évora / PT | 05 /
MONTEIRO, Rui, A. 7005-639 Évora / PT | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/26] | Goodman, Simon John Nye Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21859059.4 | 18.08.2021 | [2023/26] | WO2021US46505 | Priority number, date | US202063067946P | 20.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063067946 P | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022040314 | Date: | 24.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4200885 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/025, H01G9/052, H01G11/04 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H01G9/052 (EP,US);
H01G9/0036 (EP,US);
H01G9/0425 (EP,US);
H01G9/07 (EP,US);
H01G9/15 (EP,US);
H01G2009/05 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Title | German: | HYBRIDKONDENSATOR MIT VERBESSERTER ESR-STABILISIERUNG | [2023/26] | English: | HYBRID CAPACITOR WITH IMPROVED ESR STABILIZATION | [2023/26] | French: | CONDENSATEUR HYBRIDE À STABILISATION ESR AMÉLIORÉE | [2023/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 21.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US7875087 (NORTON JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1-65* ; entire document *; | [YA]US2018323015 (ANDORALOV VICTOR [SE], et al) [Y] 1-2, 5, 13-16, 31-37, 40, 48-51 * ; para [0013]-[0014], [0036], [0039], [0051], [0053] * [A] 3-4, 6-12, 17-30, 38-39, 41-47, 52-65; | [YA]US2018374649 (ISHIKAWA AKIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-2, 5, 13-16, 31-37, 40,48-51 * ; para [0014], [0018]-[0019], [0092] * [A] 3-4, 6-12, 17-30, 38-39,41-47, 52-65; | [YA]US2019172652 (BILER MARTIN [CZ], et al) [Y] 1-2, 5, 13-16, 31-37, 40,48-51 * ; para [0003], [0036], [0058] * [A] 3-4, 6-12, 17-30, 38-39,41-47, 52-65; | [A]US2020105479 (MATSUSHITA SHUMPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-65 * ; entire document * |