EP4194299 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLANNING LANE-CHANGING TRAJECTORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Xiaobin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 21859667.4 | 29.04.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021CN91075 | Priority number, date | CN202010882785 | 28.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010882785 | [2023/24] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022041820 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194299 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/18, B60W60/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
B60W30/18163 (EP,CN,US);
B60W60/001 (EP,US);
B60W60/0015 (CN);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP);
B60W2710/20 (US);
B60W2710/207 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | B60W30/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PLANUNG EINER SPURWECHSELTRAJEKTORIE | [2023/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLANNING LANE-CHANGING TRAJECTORY | [2023/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PLANIFICATION DE TRAJECTOIRE DE CHANGEMENT DE FILE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2023 | Translation filed | 07.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 22.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US9227632 (LEE JIN-WOO [US]); | [Y]US2017364083 (YANG WENLI [CN], et al); | [Y]US2019100211 (LIU WEI [CN], et al); | [Y]US2019122556 (THAPANI RAMESH VEERABHADRA PANTULU BALADANDAYU [US], et al); | [Y]CN111267857 (SANY HEAVY IND CO LTD) | International search | [A]DE102016213369 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE102016220717 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]CN110304045 (INST AUTOMATION CAS); | [A]CN110562258 (UISEE TECH BEIJING CO LTD); | [Y]CN111164455 (VEONEER US INC); | [Y]CN111267857 (SANY HEAVY IND CO LTD) |