EP4199406 - SIGNAL GENERATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Qi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HU, Yuanzhou Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HE, Gaoning Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LU, Jianmin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 21860181.3 | 13.08.2021 | [2023/25] | WO2021CN112601 | Priority number, date | CN202010897996 | 31.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010897996 | [2023/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022042343 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4199406 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04L25/03 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H04L27/2602 (EP,CN);
H04L25/03828 (EP,CN);
H04L27/2637 (US);
H04J11/0023 (CN);
H04L25/03012 (EP,CN);
H04L25/03878 (CN);
H04L27/0004 (CN);
H04L27/0006 (CN);
H04L27/26025 (EP,US);
H04L27/2607 (EP);
H04L27/264 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0062 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04L5/0098 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/25] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] | Title | German: | SIGNALERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2023/25] | English: | SIGNAL GENERATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2023/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE SIGNAL | [2023/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2023 | Translation filed | 13.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 25.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JAVAD ABDOLI ET AL, "Filtered OFDM: A new waveform for future wireless systems", 2015 IEEE 16TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SIGNAL PROCESSING ADVANCES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS (SPAWC), (20150601), doi:10.1109/SPAWC.2015.7227001, ISBN 978-1-4799-1931-4, pages 66 - 70, XP055276435 [A] 1-15 * Sections I-III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SPAWC.2015.7227001 |