EP4096204 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING COMMUNICATION SERVICE STATE, TERMINAL DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park No. 8089, Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YE, Fei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 02 /
QI, Yunfei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 21860602.8 | 22.10.2021 | [2022/48] | WO2021CN125877 | Priority number, date | CN202010863763 | 25.08.2020 Original published format: CN202010863763 | [2022/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022042770 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096204 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4096204 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04W4/00, H04M1/72412, H04W4/80 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
H04M1/72412 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/72409 (CN);
H04M1/72439 (CN);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,CN);
H04M2250/04 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H04M1/725, H04W4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSDIENSTZUSTANDS, ENDGERÄT UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/48] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING COMMUNICATION SERVICE STATE, TERMINAL DEVICE AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ÉTAT DE SERVICE DE COMMUNICATION, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2022/48] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2022/48: The restoration of the right of priority granted by the receiving Office is effective before the EPO (R. 49ter.1(a) PCT) | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2022 | Translation filed | 25.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |