EP4203793 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR QUANTIFYING ATTENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innereye Ltd. 85 Medinat Hayehudim Street, Building G PO Box 12952 4676670 Herzeliya / IL | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARPAZ, Yuval 7629110 Rehovot / IL | 02 /
GEVA, Amir B. 4659075 Herzliya / IL | 03 /
DEOUELL, Leon Y. 6326135 Tel-Aviv / IL | 04 /
VAISMAN, Sergey 5251302 Ramat-Gan / IL | 05 /
SHALOM, Yaar 6330252 Tel Aviv / IL | 06 /
OTSUP, Michael 4648570 Herzliya / IL | 07 /
MEIR, Yonatan 4972414 Petah Tikva / IL | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Greiner, Elisabeth df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 21860758.8 | 25.08.2021 | [2023/27] | WO2021IL51046 | Priority number, date | US202063069742P | 25.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063069742 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022044013 | Date: | 03.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203793 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 03.03.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/378, A61B5/38, A61B5/11, G06F3/01, G06N3/08, G06N3/02 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/015 (EP,IL);
A61B5/165 (US);
A61B5/0205 (US);
A61B5/1118 (EP,IL);
A61B5/16 (EP,IL);
A61B5/374 (US);
A61B5/377 (US);
A61B5/378 (EP,IL);
A61B5/38 (EP,IL);
A61B5/7267 (EP,IL,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,IL);
G06N3/04 (EP,IL);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N7/01 (EP,IL);
G06N7/023 (EP,IL);
G06F2203/011 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG DER AUFMERKSAMKEIT | [2023/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR QUANTIFYING ATTENTION | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE QUANTIFICATION DE L'ATTENTION | [2023/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012172743 (AGUILAR MARIO [US], et al); | International search | [XY]WO2016193979 (INNEREYE LTD [IL]); |